U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.