U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manny
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2023: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • October 21, 2022: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.