U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.