U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • October 24, 2022: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.