U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Batterton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 03, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.