U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stebbins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 17, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.