U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cervantes Samaniego
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • January 04, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.