U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vega Carmona et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 22, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2022: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Vacate]
  • December 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Interpreter Used]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Vacate]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.