U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trumbull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [U.S. Supreme Court Document]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [U.S. Supreme Court Document]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 11, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 11, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.