U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weatherwax
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.