U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Nepstad v. Mandella et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 22, 2023: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 19, 2023: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • January 03, 2023: [Social Security Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • January 03, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 29, 2022: [Counterclaim]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 01, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.