U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jefferson et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.