U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wahl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.