U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shields et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.