U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conroy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 23, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 18, 2023: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 04, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.