U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Snyder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.