U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Detention Hearing - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.