U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • January 03, 2023: [Appear]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.