U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Remark - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 08, 2022: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • November 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.