U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:10-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rhodes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 15, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.