U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bulltail et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Release Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2023: [Expedite ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Letter - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.