U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Save the Yellowstone Grizzly v. United States Department of Interior, Fish and Wildlife Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 13, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 05, 2023: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • December 23, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 17, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.