U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kerry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • November 17, 2022: [Summons]
  • November 17, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.