U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leider
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.