U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 08, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.