U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waldeck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Trial Brief ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.