U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stennerson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Remark - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.