U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dugan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.