U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Olson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 09, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.