U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.