U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hudshon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.