U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Olson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.