U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Biggs et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 02, 2025: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 05, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Appoint Counsel ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 30, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.