U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herbert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.