U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Limberhand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.