U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rudnitskiy, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 22, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.