U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Payne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Letter - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.