U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rutledge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 24, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.