U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monroy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.