U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Smith v. Corecivic Prison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Remark]
  • December 08, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • December 05, 2022: [Waiver of Reply LR 12.1 - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.