U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.