U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meyer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.