U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deserly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.