U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2023: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.