U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Werk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.