U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ream
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment ]
  • March 16, 2025: [Alter Judgment ]
  • March 16, 2025: [Amend/Correct ]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.