U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.