U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marceau et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Arrest ]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.