U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mount
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.