U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carnefix
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Release Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.